NATIONAL GOVERNANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The encouragement and maintainance of good school governance, and the support, by the provision of relevant information and other means, of school governors
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,339,031
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.31m | |
Other trading activities | £15.12k | |
Investments | £4.93k | |
Other | £13.42k |
Total expenditure:
£3,229,840
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.23m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.23m | |
Retained for future use | £109.19k |
People

46 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 3 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 July 1998: Standard registration
- 22 December 2021: Funds received from 1171328 FOUNDATION FOR LEADERSHIP IN EDUCATION
- NGA (Working name)
- NATIONAL GOVERNORS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL GOVERNORS' COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Tulley | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|||||||
Jane Edminson | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Jeff Quantrill | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|||||||
Michelle Anne Foster | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Langan | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Annie McMaster | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Bobby Thandi | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Anthea Jane Kenna | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
Alastair Cowen | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Lawayne Alexandria jefferson | Trustee | 26 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.54m | £2.68m | £2.69m | £2.86m | £3.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.49m | £2.36m | £2.41m | £3.21m | £3.23m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £628.60k | £424.12k | £258.70k | £276.58k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £45.91k | £17.87k | £21.53k | £7.92k | £15.12k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.50m | £2.66m | £2.69m | £2.86m | £3.31m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.68k | £1.39k | £791 | £2.53k | £4.93k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £13.42k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.49m | £2.36m | £2.41m | £3.21m | £3.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £40.79k | £16.93k | £27.06k | £25.94k | £21.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £18.45k | £26.76k | £30.65k | £22.00k | £8.30k | |
|
Long-term investments | £7.59k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.07m | £1.38m | £1.41m | £1.29m | £1.15m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £881.77k | £868.19k | £593.42k | £816.13k | £552.72k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 DEC 2016 as amended on 10 Jan 2022 as amended on 12 Nov 2022 as amended on 17 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN THROUGH (A) THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS; AND (B) THE RAISING OF THE EFFECTIVENESS OF GOVERNING BODIES OF SUCH INSTITUTIONS ("GOVERNING BODIES") BY THE PROVISION OF RELEVANT INFORMATION, ADVICE AND TRAINING TO SUCH GOVERNING BODIES, AND TO MEMBERS THEREOF ("GOVERNORS")
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
National Governance Association
102 Colmore Row
BIRMINGHAM
B3 3AG
- Phone:
- 01212373780
- Email:
- LARA.ANGELL@NGA.ORG.UK
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window