GROUP ANALYSIS SOUTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Group analysis is a way of understanding the dynamics of groups-including family groups, and increasing the well being of their members. GASW provides both group analytic psychotherapy in statutory & voluntary sector agencies for the benefit of mental health service users, and training at different levels for cliniciants and managers wishing to develop their knowledge of group analysis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 26 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Evelyn Rose Body | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wilde | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alex Collins | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Laura Howard | Trustee | 23 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.50k | £16.69k | £19.16k | £27.80k | £18.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.84k | £18.72k | £25.75k | £29.49k | £22.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 19 MARCH 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY OF THE FULL RANGE OF PSYCHOLOGICAL AND PSYCHIATRIC DISORDERS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF TREATMENT; B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS TO QUALIFY THEM FOR THE CONDUCT AND STUDY OF GROUP ANALYSIS BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL COURSES, EXTRA MURAL COURSES AND LECTURES FOR THE STUDY AND PRACTICAL APPLICATION THEREOF;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BRISTOL, DEVON, DORSET, SOMERSET AND WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 SYDENHAM ROAD
COTHAM
BRISTOL
BS6 5SH
- Phone:
- 01179423343
- Email:
- info@gasw.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window