CHRISTIAN MOTORCYCLISTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We attend a wide range of motorcycle events across the British Isles, seeking to demonstrate and live out the good news and hope of the Christian message; particularly its relevance to every biker, personally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
417 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 May 2000: Standard registration
- CMA UK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam John Baker | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Hogan | Trustee | 18 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fraser Charles McDougall | Trustee | 21 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian John Carbonero | Trustee | 23 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.51k | £57.08k | £54.24k | £357.78k | £161.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.76k | £46.19k | £52.85k | £139.98k | £169.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MARCH 2000. AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 26 APR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2011 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO PROPAGATE THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL; 2) TO PROVIDE FOR MOTORCYCLISTS AND OTHERS TEACHING IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS REVEALED BY THE BIBLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 8155
LOUGHBOROUGH
LE11 9AR
- Phone:
- 0800 0154479
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window