Financial history CHAMPIONS CHURCH

Charity number: 1072264
Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £610.31k £638.82k £530.59k £645.07k £616.57k
Total expenditure £576.29k £560.55k £460.70k £482.60k £551.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.02k £12.62k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £534.04k £562.16k £513.96k £582.95k £538.83k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £76.26k £76.66k £16.62k £62.12k £77.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £5 £10
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £576.29k £560.55k £460.70k £482.60k £486.42k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.00k £69.26k £0 £0 £2.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.00k £9.65k £6.79k £25.00k £3.34k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £65.51k