BANGLADESH MULTI-PURPOSE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION, EMPLOYMENT & TRAINING, HOUSING AND GENERAL ADVICE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £79,686 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 14 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUHAMMED ABDUL GAFUR | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
ABDUL RASHID | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED FIRUJ KHAN | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
FAIZUR RAHMAN CHOUDHURY MBE | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
KAZI MOHAMMED ANGUR MIAH | Trustee | 15 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shaheda Begum Chowdhury | Trustee | 30 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANA MIAH | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABUL FAZAL MOHAMMED KAMRUL HASSAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.33k | £68.50k | £65.61k | £69.00k | £113.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.69k | £71.56k | £70.42k | £65.20k | £111.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £51.10k | £18.37k | £32.50k | £79.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 NOVEMBER 1998 as amended on 11 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BIRMINGHAM, IN PARTICULAR THE BANGLADESH COMMUNITY, BY PROMOTING THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH, ADVANCING EDUCATION AND TRAINING, RELIEVING POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bangladesh Multipurpose Centre
136-148 Victoria Road
Aston
BIRMINGHAM
B6 5HH
- Phone:
- 0121-326 9500
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window