EAST PARK HOSTEL FOR THE HOMELESS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of homelessness by giving accommodatio, housing & support.. Relief of poverty and advancement of health. Helping people with disabilities & addictions. Includes peopleog all ages. We provide human resources and buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 13 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristina Wai Fong Rice | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hilary Edith Halstead | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Hollis | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Anne Ekins | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Elizabeth Wheeler | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Rodhouse | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN VINCENT BILLINGS | Trustee | 16 July 1998 |
|
|||||
GILLIAN MARY BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.49k | £20.76k | £20.23k | £21.51k | £23.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.96k | £15.59k | £16.18k | £14.85k | £9.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH JULY 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF SHORT STAY HOSTEL ACCOMMODATION FOR HOMELESS PEOPLE OF ALL AGES, WHETHER MARRIED OR SINGLE, INCLUDING FAMILIES WITH CHILDREN. TO ENCOURAGE INDIVIDUALS TO BECOME INDEPENDENT. TO ASSIST WITH THEIR REHABILITATION INTO THE COMMUNITY AND TO MOTIVATE AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO FIND PERMANENT ACCOMMODATION AND EMPLOYMENT. TO WORK CLOSELY WITH SOCIAL SERVICES AND OTHER AGENCIES WITH SIMILAR OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELMSGARTH
19 HIGH STREET
WESTON FAVELL
NORTHAMPTON
NN3 3JS
- Phone:
- 01604408795
- Email:
- stephenbillings@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
talktalk.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window