FilmBath LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FilmBath LTD organises and presents the FilmBath Festival annually, as well as a series of other cinema - related events and activities throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Gloucestershire
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 31 May 2000: Standard registration
- FilmBath LTD (Working name)
- BATH FILM FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- BATH FILM FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- BFF (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Taylor-Matthews | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hall | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian David Martin | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Harris | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wilkley | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Raby | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Rebecca McDonald | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parang Khezri | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Griffith | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Haigh | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tara Barnett | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Murray Kenneth | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.83k | £116.77k | £70.02k | £78.85k | £73.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.77k | £112.16k | £69.71k | £82.64k | £99.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 APRIL 2000 as amended on 23 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO PURSUE THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS"). A TO PROMOTE APPRECIATION OF AND EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS AND THEIR ASSOCIATED TECHNOLOGIES, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE OF THE CINEMA AND OTHER FORMS OF MOVING IMAGES, AND INCLUDING THOSE OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCING, MIME, GRAPHIC ARTS, PAINTING, SCULPTURE, LITERATURE, POETRY AND ORATORY ARTS. B TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING THE CREATIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS OF CINEMA, VIDEO AND OTHER FORMS OF MOVING IMAGES, INCLUDING DIRECTING. SCRIPT-WRITING, FILM EDITING, CINEMATOGRAPHY, SCORE-WRITING, SET AND MODEL MAKING, LIGHTING, FILM AND VIDEO PROJECTION, AND ALL OTHER FILM AND VIDEO-RELATED ARTS AND SKILLS C TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY, AESTHETICS AND THEORY OF MOVING IMAGES IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BATH AND NORTH-EAST SOMERSET, WILTSHIRE, SOMERSET & GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
FilmBath LTD
4 Chapel Row
BATH
BA1 1HN
- Phone:
- 01225 463 458
- Email:
- hello@filmbath.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window