Trustees FilmBath LTD
Charity number: 1080952
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Taylor-Matthews | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Hall | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian David Martin | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Harris | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Wilkley | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Raby | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ella Rebecca McDonald | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parang Khezri | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Griffith | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Haigh | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tara Barnett | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Murray Kenneth | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.