CHANA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1070196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

CHANA is a non-profit organisation set up to provide support and up-to-date medical information to couples in the Jewish Community and their extended families who experience difficulties with fertility. CHANA aims to raise awareness in the community and help reduce the stigma and isolation so often felt by those challenged with infertility.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 June 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID RABSON Trustee 09 January 2017
TREE OF LIFE TALMUDICAL COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE SHATNEZ CENTRE TRUST
Received: On time
BAILA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HATZOLA EDGWARE
Received: On time
CHANA CHARITY LTD
Received: On time
EDGWARE AND DISTRICT COMMUNAL MIKVEH COMMITTEE
Received: On time
EDGWARE HATZOLA HOLDINGS LTD
Received: 47 days late
URI GOLDBERG Trustee 16 December 2016
UNIVERSITY JEWISH CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
CHANA CHARITY LTD
Received: On time
MARTIN STIMLER Trustee 13 December 2016
CHANA CHARITY LTD
Received: On time
BENRUBEN LIMITED
Received: On time
STIMLER TZEDOKOH LIMITED
Received: On time
Bernard Groszman Trustee 01 October 2014
HC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHANA CHARITY LTD
Received: On time
KEF KIDS
BEIS HAMEDRASH NISHMAS YISROEL LIMITED
Received: On time
ESTI GROSSKOPF Trustee 06 April 1998
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/10/2019 01/10/2020 01/10/2021 01/10/2022 01/10/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £63.16k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 October 2023 19 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2022 20 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 October 2019 14 September 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
91 BRIDGE LANE
LONDON
NW11 0EE
Phone:
02034112001