DOVETAIL BIGGIN HILL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a meeting place and activities for adults with disabilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Bromley
Governance
- 30 December 1998: Standard registration
- 17 May 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2012 | 30/06/2013 | 30/06/2014 | 30/06/2015 | 30/06/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £875 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 04 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 01 June 2016 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2014 | 17 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2013 | 30 May 2014 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH APRIL 1998, AND AMENDED 29TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AGED 18 AND OVER IN BIGGIN HILL AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BROMLEY, IN SUCH WAYS AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE THINKS FIT, AND PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY OPERATING A CLUB PROVIDING CARE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
BIGGIN HILL AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window