Accounts and annual returns THE UK ALCOHOL FORUM

Charity number: 1089376
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 14 August 2013 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 14 August 2013 561 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required