Financial history THE UK ALCOHOL FORUM

Charity number: 1089376
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A