FRIENDS OF THE COMMUNITY OF ADDERBURY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VARIETY OF FUND RAISING TO ENABLE MORE OPENING HOURS AND THE PURCHASE OF MORE EQUIPMENT AND BOOKS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 August 1998: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 October 2011: Re-registered
- FOCAL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wingrove | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Phipps | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £5.89k | £4.49k | £8.14k | £8.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.34k | £1.57k | £4.21k | £15.51k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 AUGUST 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF ADDERBURY LIBRARY, THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUP OF FRIENDS.
Area of benefit
ADDERBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Adderbury Library
High Street
Adderbury
BANBURY
Oxfordshire
OX17 3LS
- Phone:
- 07539383629
- Email:
- info@adderburyfocal.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window