CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity Number: 1073355
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Conservation International UK continue to work to attract voluntary donations to assist projects around the world and to preserve global biodiversity.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 January 1999: Standard registration
  • 24 April 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 24 April 2024: Funds transferred to 1200955 CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL UK
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CI-UK (Working name)
  • CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL - UK (Previous name)
  • CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL EUROPE (Previous name)
  • CONSERVATION INTERNATIONAL EURPOE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £254.70k £383.99k £180.45k £5.03m £4.14m
Total expenditure £7.44k £274.73k £503.30k £5.02m £89.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £5.03m £4.14m
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £38 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £5.02m £89.82k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £11.25k £14.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £5.01m £75.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Other assets N/A N/A N/A £51.92k £4.17m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A £11.54k £84.15k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 25 April 2022 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 28 April 2021 On Time