MID-BUCKS (AYLESBURY) U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides opportunities for continued education, and companionship, for people who have retired or semi-retired.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 25 June 1998: Standard registration
- MID-BUCKS (AYLESBURY)U3A (Previous name)
- THE MID-BUCKS U3A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Robert James White | Chair | 16 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Sandra Chaudhry | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Doreen Russell | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David John Mummery MBE BEM | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Blackburn | Trustee | 17 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chris Blaik | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Walden | Trustee | 15 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | £2.58k | £1.65k | £7.35k | £7.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £1.22k | £3.50k | £7.00k | £7.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/1998 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2001 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
AYLESBURY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tall Trees
Chapel Lane
Stoke Mandeville
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 5UU
- Phone:
- 07881768449
- Email:
- treasurer@u3a.co
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window