MOMENTUM (NORFOLK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Volunteers who work with young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2016
Total income includes £89,090 from government contract(s) and £95,000 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 08 October 1998: Standard registration
- 13 December 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 13 December 2016: Funds transferred to 1161839 MOMENTUM (NORFOLK)
- NORFOLKCVYS (Working name)
- NORFOLK COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY YOUTH SERVICES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £595.11k | £299.54k | £336.51k | £260.28k | £261.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £488.28k | £471.60k | £289.30k | £268.24k | £234.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £89.09k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £215.97k | £95.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £458.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £135.52k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £440.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 05 January 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 23 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 23 January 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1998 AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2001, 8 JUNE 2006 AND 22 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN NORFOLK, PARTICULARLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC UP TO THE AGE OF 25 YEARS BY ASSOCIATING THE VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS AND MEMBER ORGANISATIONS OF THE COUNCIL IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH YOUNG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window