THE CITY & EAST LONDON BEREAVEMENT SERVICE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for bereaved people who live in Tower Hamlets or who are patients, or relatives/friends of patients of Barts Health NHS Trust. Offering Bereavement Counselling, Bereavement Counselling for couples after the death of a child, Volunteer visiting service for bereaved people, Muslim Volunteer visiting service for bereaved Muslim people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 April 2017
Total income includes £75,810 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 September 1998: Standard registration
- 12 December 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 12 December 2018: Funds transferred to 1169797 CITY & EAST LONDON BEREAVEMENT SERVICE
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 19/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.39k | £223.60k | £153.57k | £97.88k | £109.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.40k | £201.63k | £176.43k | £135.26k | £127.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £72.36k | £74.63k | £75.81k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £52.50k | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 19 April 2017 | 07 June 2018 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 April 2017 | 01 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 06 June 2017 | 126 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 04 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 23 April 2016 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 22 January 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE PSYCHOLOGICALLY, EMOTIONALLY OR OTHERWISE DISTRESSED BY DEATH OR TERMINAL ILLNESS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS, INCLUDING PATIENTS, RELATIVES, PARTNERS OR FRIENDS OF PATIENTS OF THE ROYAL HOSPITALS NHS TRUST.
Area of benefit
TOWER HAMLETS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window