Financial history DOCKLANDS OUTREACH COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 1071838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £252.40k £315.91k £422.46k £498.56k £692.08k
Total expenditure £227.88k £219.17k £278.00k £344.95k £373.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £91.92k £68.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £692.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £362.92k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £8.52k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.66k