THE CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY BRIGHTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting young homeless and insecurely housed people aged 16-25 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 28 July 1998: Standard registration
- 31 July 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 31 July 2014: Funds transferred to 1146777 THE CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.00k | £124.31k | £110.52k | £145.92k | £126.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.76k | £102.43k | £120.69k | £128.23k | £104.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 30 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 30 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 02 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 02 August 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 25 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 15 June 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 15 June 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 15 June 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 1 JUNE 1998, AMENDED ON THE 7 JULY 1998.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS "THE OBJECTS" ARE THE RELIEF OF YOUNG HOMELESS PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS WHO SEEK ASSISTANCE AT THE CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY IN BRIGHTON SUSSEX, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: TO SUPPORT THEM BETWEEN INSECURE ACCOMMODATION AND PERMANENT HOUSING. TO PROVIDE A WARM AND CARING ENVIRONMENT AT THE CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY BRIGHTON. TO REFER THEM TO HOUSING SERVICES AND THE OTHER ORGANISATIONS, DEPENDING ON THEIR IMMEDIATE NEEDS. TO LIAISE WITH OTHER HOUSING SERVICES ON THEIR BEHALF. TO BUILD UP A RESOURCE BANK OF HOUSING INFORMATION FOR THE USE OF THE CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY BRIGHTON AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS THAT WOULD BENEFIT FROM SUCH INFORMATION. TO ARTICULATE THE ISSUE OF HOMELESSNESS TO THE AUTHORITIES THAT CAN HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN BRIGHTON AND HOVE. TO PROVIDE DRINKS, FOOD AND CLOTHING PLUS BEDDING AND UTENSILS FOR THOSE IN INSECURE ACCOMMODATION. TO PROVIDE A LISTENING EAR AND ADVOCATE ON THEIR BEHALF.
Area of benefit
CLOCK TOWER SANCTUARY IN BRIGHTON SUSSEX.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window