THE MAGENI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donates money to other charities across a range of activities. Does not give grants to individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 July 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Collins | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALEX COLLINS | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Collins | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARF COLLINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £900.01k | £144.00k | £147.00k | £144.20k | £144.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.51k | £139.55k | £141.03k | £141.79k | £148.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £900.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £5 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £142.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £5.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £139.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £5.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 10 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JUNE 1998.
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leslie Cottage
The Promenade
Pevensey Bay
PEVENSEY
BN24 6HE
- Phone:
- 01323460770
- Email:
- garfcollins@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window