HAMPTON & MOLESEY RIVERSIDE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity is a campaigning organisation which aims to preserve, protect and enhance features of amenity, beauty and historical interest on the riversides at Hampton & Molesey, and promote public access to/usage of the river and its environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 January 1999: Standard registration
- H.R.T. (Working name)
- HAMPTON RIVERSIDE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzette Nicholson CLLR | Chair | 21 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Edward Moulton Bates | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr John William Nicholson | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Paula Day | Trustee | 24 June 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JILL SANDERS | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
SUELLEN RAVEN | Trustee | 14 December 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN SHEAF | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|||||||||
HEATHER ELLIOTT | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 02/08/2022 | 02/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £375 | £3.48k | £0 | £160 | £481 | |
|
Total expenditure | £98 | £0 | £374 | £262 | £232 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 August 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/07/1997 AS AMENDED ON 29/10/1998 AS AMENDED ON 24/05/2012
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE APPEARANCE AND AMENITIES OF THE HAMPTON AND MOLESEY RIVERSIDES FROM PLATT’S EYOT TO CIGARETTE ISLAND, PROTECT THEM FROM HARMFUL DEVELOPMENT, AND IMPROVE THE PUBLIC’S ACCESS TO, AND USAGE OF, THAT REACH OF THE THAMES.
Area of benefit
HAMPTON AND MOLESEY RIVERSIDES
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 BUCKINGHAM ROAD
HAMPTON
TW12 3JG
- Phone:
- 02089798379
- Website:
-
Www.hmrt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window