CONSTANTINE ENTERPRISES COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
activities for the benefit of the community of constantine
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 06 October 1998: Standard registration
- CEC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dimitri Panagiotis BLACKSTONE-KARAPANOS | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Gent Clarke | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gerelyn Blackstone-Karapanos | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
caitlin o'brian DeSilvey | Trustee | 19 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
douglas john jeffries | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr christopher robert hussey | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD GRAHAM THOMAS | Trustee | 18 May 2009 |
|
|||||
Peter Harold Tatham | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES LOCKHART PUGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.09k | £56.22k | £64.17k | £4.60k | £35.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.50k | £35.40k | £35.40k | £16.54k | £11.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £16.26k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 20 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15 AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CONSTANTINE PARISH BEING FACILITIES. A) OF WHICH THESE PERSONS HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SPECIAL RESOLUTION)
Area of benefit
CONSTANTINE PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Treworval Farm
Mawnan Smith
FALMOUTH
Cornwall
TR11 5JW
- Phone:
- 07776140988
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window