Financial history TEIGNMOUTH MEDICAL PRACTICE PATIENT SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 1071818
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £629 £4.27k £1.36k £1.14k £319
Total expenditure £4.11k £3.07k £1.34k £742 £762
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A