BURY AND DISTRICT YOUNG FARMERS' CLUB

Charity Number: 1070340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The club generally meets weekly on a Monday evening to participate in various activities which aid the development of our members who tend to have an interest in agriculture and the environment. Our motto is fun, learning and achievement. Membership age is currently 10-28 years old. The club is also affiliated to Lancashire Federation of YFC's and the National Federation - NFYFC.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £2,798
Total expenditure: £2,142

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 July 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BURY YFC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Patricia Bracewell Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record
Beverley Earnshaw Trustee 05 September 2022
None on record
MOIRA ANN ROBERTS Trustee 08 September 2014
None on record
SUE DAVIES MBA, CMI Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL FISH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.59k £1.16k £50 £4.06k £2.80k
Total expenditure £4.63k £1.88k £970 £4.50k £2.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 August 2024 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 23 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 12 April 2021 286 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Bank Top Farm
Bank Top
Hollingworth Road
LITTLEBOROUGH
Lancashire
OL15 0AU
Phone:
01706376574