BEACONSFIELD FESTIVAL OF LIGHTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Festival of lights evening before Christmas each year in Beaconsfield Town.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 05 October 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY MOXLEY | Chair | 04 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.95k | £6.66k | £21.07k | £20.24k | £18.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.30k | £1.65k | £18.61k | £18.58k | £17.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 204 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND MARCH 1998, AND AMENDED 10TH SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BEACONSFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT). THE PAYMENT OF GRANTS FROM FUNDS RAISED DURING THE BEACONSFIELD FESTIVAL OF LIGHTS AND SUCH OTHER EVENTS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL ORGANISE, FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES, AT THEIR DISCRETION, SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
BEACONSFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Bealings End
Beaconsfield
HP9 2AW
- Phone:
- 01494672229
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window