Trustees SAFER WALES
Charity Number: 1071243

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WOOLLEY CHRISTOPHER JOHN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Craig J Barnsley FCCA | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azuka Elizabeth Oforka | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Salter CIPFA | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Katherine Sian Williams | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Keetch | Trustee | 12 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jacqueline Jones FRSA | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR MIKE MAGUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS KATHRYN-ANN SLADE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.