THE HERB SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society was founded in 1927 to promote, improve and increase the appreciation and use of herbs within the community and the prevention of disease. Its principal activities are: (a) Increase the understanding and use of herbs for health and well being. (b) Provide information, knowledge and news on all aspects of herbs. (c) Bring together all those with an interest in herbs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 September 1998: Standard registration
- HERB SOCIETY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mona Channet | Trustee | 28 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Rowland | Trustee | 21 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Atma Kaur Narinder | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Shore | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Morgan-Owen | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Howe | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM DICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.31k | £41.15k | £45.43k | £46.37k | £47.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.93k | £34.59k | £37.10k | £41.62k | £34.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 January 2020
(These accounts |
14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY BY PROMOTING, IMPROVING AND INCREASING, BY ALL PRACTICABLE METHODS, THE KNOWLEDGE AND USE OF HERBS IN THE PRESERVATION OF THE COMMUNITY AND THE PREVENTION OF DISEASE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 196
Liverpool
LX18 1XE
- Phone:
- 08454918699
- Email:
- info@herbsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window