Trustees THE HERB SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1071779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mona Channet Trustee 28 May 2025
None on record
Ellen Rowland Trustee 21 April 2025
None on record
Atma Kaur Narinder Trustee 28 February 2025
None on record
Lynn Shore Trustee 10 January 2025
None on record
Kate Morgan-Owen Trustee 11 December 2024
None on record
Nicola Howe Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Barbara Wilkinson Trustee 12 August 2014
None on record
MALCOLM DICKSON Trustee
None on record