THE ILKLEY & DISTRICT THIRD AGE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Monthly meetings at Clarke Foley Centre for a presentation, coffee and social interaction. 130 groups including: arts, languages, humanities, science and environment bridge, crossword compiling, discussion and debating, mah jong, scrabble physical activities: circle dancing, croquet, table-tennis, Tai Chi, Yoga,variety of walking groups visits in this country and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
2000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Bradford City
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 August 1998: Standard registration
- ILKLEY & DISTRICT U3A (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard William Bell | Chair | 19 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicola Jane Falconer | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Blewitt | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Billings | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI WELLBROOK | Trustee | 19 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret McCabe | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.94k | £30.75k | £86.18k | £126.71k | £144.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.40k | £24.26k | £84.73k | £112.70k | £131.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 08 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
ILKLEY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Clarke Foley Centre
Cunliffe Road
ILKLEY
LS29 9DZ
- Phone:
- 01943 608823
- Email:
- secretary@ilkleyu3a.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window