SEA SAFETY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To enquire into and to advance public education for the benefit of the public in all the matters of the safety of mariners and ships of all descriptions at sea. To undertake coastal surveillance duties in the areas currently covered by group members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hartlepool
- Norfolk
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Suffolk
Governance
- 10 March 1999: Standard registration
- 18 October 2023: Funds received from 1179479 WINTERTON COASTWATCH
- SSG (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR SMITH | Chair | 31 March 2011 |
|
|||||
Geoff Mann | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Finlay | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Captain Anthony Probert Starling Lark | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MOORE | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £250 | £6.27k | £595 | £554 | |
|
Total expenditure | £257 | £347 | £410 | £402 | £377 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO ENQUIRE INTO AND TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE MATTERS OF THE SAFETY OF MARINERS AND SHIPS OF ALL DESCRIPTIONS AT SEA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE IN EUROPE AFRICA AUSTRALIA CANADA AND UNITED STATES
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Beech Road
Carlton Colville
Lowestoft
NR33 8JG
- Phone:
- 07799173071
- Email:
- info@seasafetygroup.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window