THE CARLSSON FAMILY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relief of poverty, in all its guises, for children and families with children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 December 1998: Standard registration
- THE ROGER CARLSSON FAMILY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER CARLSSON | Chair | 21 October 1998 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mary Louise Chapman | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Thomas J Melk | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CARINA CARLSSON | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
COURTNEY CARLSSON | Trustee | 16 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HUNT | Trustee | 21 October 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.01k | £110 | £0 | £0 | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £255.04k | £2.68k | £3.41k | £3.42k | £3.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 10 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST OCTOBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES INCLUDING THOSE CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES REFERRED TO IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Endsleigh Street
LONDON
WC1H 0DS
- Phone:
- 01344429204
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window