LITTLE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education in the arts in Burton upon Trent and District by the production of one or more dramatic stage plays or musicals each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 October 1998: Standard registration
- 13 January 2023: Funds received from 501147 BURTON UPON TRENT AND DISTRICT ARTS COUNCIL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BOWNESS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Joseph Robinson | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Spencer | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE MEAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFF THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MCPHEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.35k | £28.64k | £6.57k | £33.84k | £47.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.68k | £26.25k | £8.02k | £37.55k | £39.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 APRIL 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY PRODUCING ONE OR MORE DRAMATIC STAGE PLAYS EACH YEAR
Area of benefit
BURTON UPON TRENT AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
377 Rosliston Road
BURTON-ON-TRENT
Staffordshire
DE15 9RJ
- Phone:
- 01283542446
- Email:
- info@little-theatre.co.uk
- Website:
-
little-theatre.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window