Financial history TAMWORTH COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1092738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.99k £5.64k £7.24k £5.22k £7.33k
Total expenditure £29.07k £13.85k £14.45k £16.70k £24.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A