Financial history THEDDLETHORPE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1073090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £18.07k £1.23k £14.89k £169.66k £255.98k
Total expenditure £10.79k £4.51k £9.21k £159.42k £256.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A £156.06k £0