ULVERSTON, FORD PARK COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support the disadvantaged and disabled through activities, training and volunteering opportunities. Manage the gardens and grounds as a public park for the enjoyment of the whole community. Organise a programme of cultural and social events. Operate and manage community facilities, food growing and education programmes in order to meet the needs of local people and visitors to Ulverston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,525 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
33 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 17 August 2001: Standard registration
- COACH HOUSE STUDIO (Working name)
- FORD PARK (Working name)
- FORD PARK COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley-Anne Wilson | Chair | 15 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Neil John Fleming | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Atkinson | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Brown | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Campbell | Trustee | 15 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.50k | £99.73k | £178.20k | £234.16k | £234.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.08k | £95.27k | £136.02k | £186.46k | £186.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.15k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.30k | £30.14k | £25.08k | £8.40k | £5.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 March 2023 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 June 2022 | 126 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 APRIL 2001 AND 8 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF ULVERSTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2) TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF ULVERSTON AND OF THE NATION, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE THAT MAY EXIST WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF FORD PARK, ULVERSTON, IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST; 3) TO ESTABLISH AND SECURE ACCESS TO FORD PARK FIELDS AND GARDENS AS A COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AMENITY AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; 4) THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON SECTARIAN.
Area of benefit
ULVERSTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ford Park Community Group
Ford Park
Ulverston
LA12 7JP
- Phone:
- 01229580666
- Email:
- info@ford-park.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window