WESTMINSTER FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and extension of Christian Science
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- France
- Germany
- Scotland
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hazel Patterson | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|||||
ANTOINETTE GLYNN | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Shirley McGrath | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|||||
John Lardge | Trustee | 03 June 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.83k | £190.70k | £183.50k | £406.29k | £209.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £429.70k | £774.28k | £556.47k | £799.15k | £2.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 March 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 8TH JULY 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3RD AUGUST 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION, UPKEEP, INSURANCE, FURNISHING, EQUIPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF PLACES OF WORSHIP, READING ROOMS AND OTHER BUILDINGS USED OR TO BE USED BY CHRISTIAN SCIENCE CHURCHES AND SOCIETIES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; (2) THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES PROVIDED FOR CHRISTIAN SCIENCE CHURCHES AND SOCIETIES; (3) THE PROMOTION OF SPIRITUAL HEALING BY THE SUPPORT OF NURSING SERVICES PROVIDED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE; (4) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE WORK OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE CHURCHES AND SOCIETIES; (5) THE PROMOTION OF OTHER RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH CHRISTIAN SCIENCE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (6) THE PROVISION OF LAND AND BUILDINGS TO BE HELD AS PERMANENT ENDOWMENT OF A CHARITY HAVING OBJECTS WITHIN OBJECTS (1) TO (5) OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 828
GODALMING
GU7 9HP
- Phone:
- 07777120432
- Website:
-
thewestminsterfund.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window