Financial history STRAUSS-ELLENBOGEN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1072290
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.23k £9.28k £9.25k £10.94k £10.71k
Total expenditure £9.43k £6.50k £6.98k £9.82k £7.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A