BROCKTON PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing pre-schooling for 2-5 year olds within our community. Linking with local primary school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Total income includes £4,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 20 October 1998: Standard registration
- BROCKTON AND DISTRICT PRE-SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR Colin Leslie Yorke | Chair | 15 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura FURNISS | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.75k | £36.62k | £36.65k | £21.77k | £32.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.73k | £29.94k | £36.07k | £35.24k | £32.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £14.89k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 355 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 721 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1086 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1086 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1451 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1451 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1816 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1816 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Scheme dated 29 October 2014
Charitable objects
The aims of the Pre-school are to enhance the development and education of children primarily under statutory school age by encouraging parents to understand and provide for the needs of their children through community groups and by: (a) offering appropriate play, education and care facilities, family learning and extended hours groups, together with the right of parents to take responsibility for and to become involved in the activities of such groups, ensuring that such groups offer opportunities for all children whatever their race, culture, religion, means or ability; (b) encouraging the study of the needs of such children and their families and promoting public interest in and recognition of such needs in the local areas; (c) Instigating and adhering to and furthering the aims and objects of the Pre-school Learning Alliance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brockton C Of E Primary School
Brockton
MUCH WENLOCK
Shropshire
TF13 6JR
- Phone:
- 01746785018
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window