Financial history DIVINE ONKAR MISSION

Charity number: 1074527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £337.04k £295.64k £429.12k £422.38k £365.21k
Total expenditure £260.66k £209.19k £272.69k £319.69k £308.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A