HARVEST FIELDS HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing good quality, affordable accommodation suitable for their tenants' needs in Sutton Coldfield.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 24 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward Robinson | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
SUSAN JOY ROBINSON | Trustee | 08 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JANET ANNE GILMOUR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £164.42k | £167.05k | £167.44k | £163.05k | £169.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.61k | £63.50k | £62.87k | £69.05k | £110.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 January 2024 | 92 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AND AS AN EXPRESSION OF CHRISTIAN WITNESS, LOVE AND CONCERN:- TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS, TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS, OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR ANY OTHER PERSONS FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION, TO PROVIDE AND/OR SUPPORT FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, TO RELIEVE THE AGED, THE POOR, THE SICK AND THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, AND TO PROVIDE AND/OR SUPPORT THE TRAINING AND PASTORAL CARE PARTICULARLY OF YOUNG PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dale Farm
Worcester Lane
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B75 5PR
- Phone:
- 01213233236
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window