MIDLAND KASHATTRI (TAANK) SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Religious ceremony held on 09 November 2014 during which, ?1125 were received as donations from the community members. 2. ?1106 were spent on religious ceremony, including Coach for the elderly. 3. A coach trip to Blackpool was arranged for poor families and children. 4. ?10000 were donated to DEC for Nepal Earth quake disaster for the help of people who lost their homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Warwickshire
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 16 December 1998: Standard registration
- MKTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pardeep Kumar Farmah | Trustee | 15 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashok Kumar Sirpal | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR SUSHIL KAINTH | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR BHAGAT SINGH AULAK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OM PARKASH SIRPAL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAIDEV SINGH KAINTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.65k | £26.30k | £26.68k | £27.54k | £35.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.81k | £18.60k | £7.66k | £2.93k | £13.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 199 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 199 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED 15 NOVEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGION BY THE TEACHING OF THE FUNDAMENTALS OF HINDUISM AND SIKHISM TO ADVANCE EDUCATION TO PROVIDE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
257 BROADWAY NORTH
WALSALL
WS1 2PS
- Phone:
- 07711065097
- Email:
- SUSHIL@EXTRU-TECH.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window