Accounts and annual returns HULL HOSTEL FORUM

Charity number: 1071813
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 31 May 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 28 March 2014 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 18 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required