Financial history ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATON PLYMOUTH BRANCH

Charity Number: 1070422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £52.73k £7.28k £14.66k £11.51k £260.55k
Total expenditure £45.85k £6.30k £19.91k £21.85k £32.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A