HARROW CENTRAL MOSQUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrow Central Mosque and Islamic Centre caters for Islamic and social needs for the community. These include the provision of prayer facilities, education for adults and children, seminars, interfaith dialogue, liason with local community and addressing matters of social welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Total income:
£687,552
Donations and legacies | £521.84k | |
Charitable activities | £91.23k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £37.66k | |
Other | £36.82k |
Total expenditure:
£511,401
Raising funds | £5.61k | |
Charitable activities | £499.68k | |
Other | £6.12k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £13,760 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.72k | |
Charitable expenditure | £499.68k | |
Retained for future use | £176.15k |
People

18 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Harrow
Governance
- 28 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tofail Ahmed | Chair | 09 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Muneeb Farooq Awan | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Mumtaz | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Usman Sajid | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ateeb Khan | Trustee | 11 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muhammed Ali Mughal | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ramzan Ibrahim | Trustee | 05 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nadeem Raza | Trustee | 03 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Naveed | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £682.28k | £723.03k | £688.43k | £548.36k | £687.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £616.15k | £633.32k | £634.07k | £420.46k | £511.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £52.02k | £13.76k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £549.27k | £565.47k | £510.75k | £416.45k | £521.84k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £74.74k | £75.80k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £58.38k | £81.77k | £105.87k | £87.54k | £91.23k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £70.16k | £43.17k | £37.66k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £1.65k | £1.20k | £36.82k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £608.32k | £605.40k | £603.91k | £404.13k | £499.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.83k | £27.93k | £30.16k | £16.33k | £5.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.40k | £31.74k | £33.88k | £16.72k | £2.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £126.41k | £99.00k | £46.25k | £73.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £6.62k | £4.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.12k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £9.85m | £8.96m | £8.97m | £8.94m | £8.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £920.00k | £935.00k | £945.00k | £945.00k | |
|
Other assets | £339.36k | £413.79k | £484.49k | £631.87k | £812.86k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £252.76k | £245.45k | £270.59k | £265.01k | £253.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 86 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 452 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 174 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 29 July 2022 | 174 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16TH AUGUST 1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAY 2003. AS AMENDED ON 25 NOV 2018 as amended on 01 Dec 2019 as amended on 27 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN, THE SUNNAH AND HADITH.
Area of benefit
HARROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harrow Central Mosque
34 Station Road
Harrow
HA1 2SQ
- Phone:
- 02088611234
- Email:
- info@harrowmosque.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window