Accounts and annual returns MEDEN CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 1071664
Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 September 2024 180 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 12 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required