Accounts and annual returns LEICESTERSHIRE CENTRE FOR INTEGRATED LIVING LIMITED

Charity Number: 1072345
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 September 2022 235 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 September 2022 235 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 September 2022 600 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required