QUAKER FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) To promote and encourage the public study of family history, genealogy, heraldry and local history with particular reference to Quakers worldwide; B) To promote the preservation, security and accessibility of archival material; C) To promote and engage in educational activities including the issue of a regular journal and the publication and sale of other appropriate material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 November 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Joan Harvey | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||
John Alan Gurney | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brylin Rae Highton | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Steevens | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Penelope Knight | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charles Edward Gurney Pease | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Peake Farrand | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Wormald | Trustee | 08 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOAN MARGARET PAGE | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.44k | £2.27k | £2.04k | £2.57k | £3.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.54k | £3.26k | £893 | £3.42k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUNE 1994 AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1996, 27 JUNE 1998 & 19 JUNE 1999. AS AMENDED ON 09 JUL 2016 as amended on 08 Jun 2019 as amended on 08 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
a) To promote and encourage the public study of family history, genealogy, heraldry and local history with particular reference to Quakers in the British and Irish Isles, but also to the diaspora; b) To promote the preservation, security and accessibility of archival material.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Palm Street
Sheffield
S6 2XF
- Phone:
- 0114 258 9437
- Email:
- chair@qfhs.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window