NORTHUMBERLAND ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Symphony Orchestra providing musical education to members through weekly rehearsals leading to a concert. Minimum of two concerts a year given within our area to members of the public. Additional concerts also given to Schools to encourage school children to play music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Durham
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 27 August 1998: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Locks | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Karen Ann Riddle | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Clark | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Tallent | Trustee | 14 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Philip Barker | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELEANOR HORN | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caterina Maria Josina Griffiths | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Robert Andrew I-Hsien Porter | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Amy Gleeson | Trustee | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Carter | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.28k | £261 | £9.34k | £9.22k | £11.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.18k | £3.75k | £10.59k | £11.27k | £10.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND BY SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE CHARITY THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Preston Mews
NORTH SHIELDS
Tyne And Wear
NE29 0NF
- Phone:
- 07743702541
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window