Financial history PARENTS FOR INCLUSION

Charity number: 1070675
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £79.90k £30.99k £22.89k £2.24k £621
Total expenditure £63.62k £80.69k £37.75k £2.62k £1.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A