OLDHAM PERSONAL ADVOCACY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Independent Advocacy Services and activities for Adults with Learning Disabilities and/autism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £23,916 from 1 government contract(s) and £24,459 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
Governance
- 10 September 1998: Standard registration
- OPAL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr JONATHAN LORD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Lomas | Trustee | 27 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Guereca | Trustee | 15 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bird | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JANE PICKERING | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA ROYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CYNTHIA BLYTHE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £241.91k | £312.94k | £300.56k | £263.81k | £303.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.70k | £247.42k | £260.27k | £314.26k | £336.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £41.06k | £40.42k | £40.85k | £46.94k | £23.92k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £7.09k | £12.87k | N/A | £24.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MAY 1998, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 10 MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES IN THE BOROUGH OF OLDHAM BEING PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF RELIEF BY REASON OF THEIR LEARNING DISABILITIES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROVIDING A SERVICE CALCULATED: (1) TO ENABLE PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS; AND (2) TO PROVIDE SUCH PEOPLE WITH PERSONAL FRIENDSHIP AND SUPPORT (3) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH MAY BE THOUGHT FIT
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF OLDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
The LINK Centre
140 Union Street
Oldham
OL1 1DZ
- Phone:
- 01616335544
- Email:
- admin@opal-advocacy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window